Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Tampico

Dioecesis Tampicensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 25 February 1958
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Monterrey
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Tamaulipas
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 22,671 (8,756 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Noreste
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesisdetampico.com.mx/
  • Mailing Address: Apartado 545, Calle Altamira 116 Oriente, 89000 Tampico, Tamps., México
  • Telephone: (833)212-28-02; 212-28-10
  • Fax: 212-67-81

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Tamaulipas
13 August 1861ErectedDiocese of Linares o Nueva León Vicariate Apostolic of Tamaulipas (erected)
Diocese of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas
12 March 1870ErectedArchdiocese of México
Diocese of Tlaxcala
Vicariate Apostolic of Tamaulipas
Diocese of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas (erected)
24 November 1922Territory LostDiocese of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas
Diocese of Veracruz-Jalapa
Diocese of Papantla (erected)
16 February 1958Territory LostDiocese of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas Diocese of Matamoros (erected)
Diocese of Tampico
25 February 1958Name ChangedDiocese of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas Diocese of Tampico
9 June 1962Territory LostDiocese of Huejutla
Diocese of Papantla
Diocese of Tulancingo
Diocese of Tampico
Diocese of Tuxpan (erected)
21 December 1964Territory LostDiocese of Matamoros
Diocese of Tampico
Diocese of Ciudad Victoria (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas
1950460,000490,00093.9%665716,478511529ap1951
Diocese of Tampico
1966349,830388,74590.0%4315586,0311514819ap1967
1970380,000400,00095.0%4314576,6661414026ap1971
1976526,156555,97794.6%4816648,2212012430ap1977
1980545,000638,00085.4%4718658,3842210035ap1981
1990778,000830,00093.7%6316799,8481813047ap1991
19991,016,6101,081,50094.0%93171109,2412516553ap2000
20001,108,0001,181,20093.8%941210610,4522016654ap2001
20011,116,6101,181,20094.5%100141149,7942116458ap2002
20021,110,6201,183,64093.8%971411110,0052015858ap2003
20031,111,0801,183,84093.9%105141199,3361915861ap2004
20041,111,6451,193,84093.1%961310910,1982014562ap2005
201011,500,0001,234,000931.9%1032212592,0002412864ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013