Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of San Luis Potosí

Archidioecesis Sancti Ludovici Potosiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 5 November 1988
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: San Luís Potosí
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 19,428 (7,504 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Bajío
  • Official Web Site: http://www.iglesiapotosina.org/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Calle Francisco Madero 300, Apartado 1, 78000 San Luis Potosi, S.L.P., México
  • Telephone: (444)812-45-55
  • Fax: 812-79-79

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of San Luis Potosí
31 August 1854ErectedDiocese of Michoacán Diocese of San Luis Potosí (erected)
27 November 1960Territory LostDiocese of Huejutla
Diocese of San Luis Potosí
Diocese of Ciudad Valles (erected)
Archdiocese of San Luis Potosí
5 November 1988ElevatedDiocese of San Luis Potosí Archdiocese of San Luis Potosí
28 May 1997Territory LostDiocese of Ciudad Valles
Archdiocese of San Luis Potosí
Diocese of Matehuala (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of San Luis Potosí
1950419,803420,58999.8%16041642,5592432455ap1951
1966600,000605,00099.2%3555906,6669650535ap1967
1970782,106800,97397.6%125421674,6836662546ap1971
1976991,9431,016,30597.6%148361845,3906656759ap1977
19801,175,6301,220,66096.3%144371816,4955961860ap1981
Archdiocese of San Luis Potosí
19902,024,1132,115,76395.7%166472139,5026451779ap1991
19991,660,1301,731,18395.9%201462476,721910174474ap2000
20001,676,7311,748,49495.9%194462406,98696574475ap2001
20011,693,4981,765,97995.9%180462267,49396553980ap2002
20021,700,0001,788,93695.0%192502427,02497265082ap2003
20031,716,6501,807,00095.0%205552606,6021016586285ap2004
20041,734,4881,825,77795.0%208502586,7221016386286ap2005
20101,845,0001,925,00095.8%212522646,98810175810107ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 4 Jul 2013