Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerardo Anaya y Diez de Bonilla

Deceased

Bishop of San Luis Potosí


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1881BornTepexpan
2 Apr 190422.5Ordained PriestPriest of México, Federal District
8 Mar 192038.4AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
13 Jun 192038.7Ordained BishopBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
3 Oct 194160.0AppointedBishop of San Luis Potosí, México
16 Jun 195876.7DiedBishop of San Luis Potosí, México

MicroData Summary for Gerardo Anaya y Diez de Bonilla:
Bishop Gerardo Anaya y Diez de Bonilla (born , died ) Bishop of San Luis Potosí

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013