Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anastasio Hurtado y Robles

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tepic, Nayarit


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1890BornMascota
7 Mar 191424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Tepic, Nayarit, México
21 Dec 193545.8AppointedBishop of Tepic, Nayarit, México
12 Apr 193646.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tepic, Nayarit, México
13 Jul 197080.4RetiredBishop of Tepic, Nayarit, México
13 Jul 197080.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Cissa
31 Dec 197080.9ResignedTitular Bishop of Cissa
24 Feb 197282.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Tepic, Nayarit, México

MicroData Summary for Anastasio Hurtado y Robles:
Bishop Anastasio Hurtado y Robles (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tepic

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 35.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013