Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Maria Campos y Angeles

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chilapa, Guerrero, México

Titular Bishop of Doara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1860Born
23 Dec 188222.5Ordained PriestPriest
3 Dec 189737.4AppointedBishop of Tabasco, México
16 Jan 189837.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tabasco, México
12 Oct 190747.3AppointedBishop of Chilapa, Guerrero, México
19 Oct 190747.3InstalledBishop of Chilapa, Guerrero, México
5 Jan 192362.5ResignedBishop of Chilapa, Guerrero, México
5 Jan 192362.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Doara
29 Jun 194585.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Chilapa, Guerrero, México

MicroData Summary for Francisco Maria Campos y Angeles
Bishop Francisco Maria Campos y Angeles (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chilapa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Nicolás de Actopan, Diocese of Tulancingo, Hidalgo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tulacingo, Diocese of Tulancingo, Hidalgo

  • a priest for 62.5 years
  • a bishop for 47.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 533
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Jun 2017