Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Tulancingo

Archidioecesis Tulancingensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 25 November 2006
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Hidalgo
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 10,696 (4,131 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Centro
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Apartado 14, Plaza de la Constitución, 43600 Tulancingo, Hgo., México
  • Telephone: (775)75.33.091
  • Fax: 75.31.010

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Tulancingo
26 January 1863ErectedArchdiocese of México Diocese of Tulancingo (erected)
24 November 1922Territory LostDiocese of Tulancingo Diocese of Huejutla (erected)
27 February 1961Territory LostArchdiocese of México
Diocese of Tulancingo
Diocese of Tula (erected)
9 June 1962Territory LostDiocese of Huejutla
Diocese of Papantla
Diocese of Tulancingo
Diocese of Tampico
Diocese of Tuxpan (erected)
Archdiocese of Tulancingo
25 November 2006ElevatedDiocese of Tulancingo Archdiocese of Tulancingo

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Tulancingo
1950626,600629,80099.5%722748,467515356ap1951
1966613,457632,46797.0%931946,5261021553ap1967
1970656,868677,71296.9%89897,380723853ap1971
1976724,895748,57996.8%79799,175522454ap1977
1980898,990961,18093.5%7948310,831813756ap1981
19901,137,9441,226,38492.8%7848213,877819558ap1991
19991,940,0002,000,00097.0%146214813,1081015074ap2000
20001,940,0002,000,00097.0%153215512,5161015074ap2001
20011,940,0002,000,00097.0%155215712,3561015083ap2004
Archdiocese of Tulancingo
20101,480,8451,607,00092.1%16281708,71012917684ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 15 Jun 2013