Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of León

Archidioecesis Leonensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 25 November 2006
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Guanajuato
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 8,110 (3,132 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Bajío
  • Official Web Site: https://arquileon.org/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Pedro Moreno 312, Apartado 108, 37000 León, Gto., México
  • Telephone: (477)713-27-47; 714-25-77

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of León
26 January 1863ErectedDiocese of Michoacán Diocese of León (erected)
Diocese of Zamora (erected)
13 October 1973Territory LostDiocese of León (Dolores Hidalgo, S. Diego de la Unión, S. Luis de la Paz. and S. Miguel Allende)
Archdiocese of Morelia (Celaya, Apaseo ei Alto, Apaseo ei Grande, Comonfort, Cortázar, Juventino Rosas, and Villagrán)
Diocese of Celaya (erected)
5 November 1988Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of León (From Morelia (Mexico) to San Luis Potosi (Mexico))
3 January 2004Territory LostDiocese of León (Irapuato and Pueblo Nuevo)
Archdiocese of Morelia (Abasolo, Cuerámaro, Huanimaro, Jaral del Progreso, Salamanca, and Valle de Santiago along with part of Pénjamo)
Diocese of Irapuato (erected)
Archdiocese of León
25 November 2006ElevatedDiocese of León Archdiocese of León

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of León
1948570,400575,00099.2%185362212,5805756250ap1951
1966999,0001,110,64289.9%274833572,7981461,10037ap1967
19701,195,4781,206,43599.1%2661013673,2571321,53243ap1971
1976999,7641,004,23699.6%209943033,2991631,04255ap1977
19801,117,9311,127,39599.2%2051143193,5043131,02562ap1981
19902,675,0002,745,00097.4%2151033188,4111711,01882ap1991
19992,939,1683,090,00095.1%2391373767,816279480110ap2000
20003,058,9673,199,20495.6%2521574097,4791941,102113ap2001
20013,364,8643,519,12495.6%2521373898,6501451,528115ap2002
20023,081,8023,210,21196.0%2521373897,92241451,443119ap2003
20033,356,8043,885,11686.4%2451814267,87941891,459119ap2004
20043,416,0003,795,96790.0%2261623888,8041701,32698ap2005
Archdiocese of León
20132,437,2532,910,39083.7%2301183487,00312197665123ap2014
20162,696,5972,955,36991.2%2351443797,11513239642123ap2017
20192,777,1603,043,77091.2%4251465714,86311234270125ap2020
20212,226,7222,447,64991.0%2361393755,93710217273132ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of León
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 81, Page 156, and Page 157
  • Archdiocese of León
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 99, Page 57, to Page 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 10 Aug 2023