Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Samuel Ruiz García

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Cristóbal de Las Casas, Chiapas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1924BornIrapuato
2 Apr 194924.4Ordained PriestPriest
14 Nov 195935.0AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
25 Jan 196035.2Ordained BishopBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
13 Mar 200075.4RetiredBishop of San Cristóbal de Las Casas, Chiapas, México
24 Jan 201186.2DiedBishop Emeritus of San Cristóbal de Las Casas, Chiapas, México

MicroData Summary for Samuel Ruiz García:
Bishop Samuel Ruiz García (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Cristóbal de Las Casas

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 51.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 3
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013