Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lucio Torreblanca y Tapia

Deceased

Archbishop of Durango, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1894Born
15 Apr 192227.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jan 194449.1AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
20 Mar 194449.2Ordained BishopBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
25 May 195964.4AppointedArchbishop of Durango, México
23 Aug 196166.6DiedArchbishop of Durango, México

MicroData Summary for Lucio Torreblanca y Tapia
Archbishop Lucio Torreblanca y Tapia (born , died ) Archbishop of Durango

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHuajuapam

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018