Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Munive Escobar

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tlaxcala, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1920Born
18 Dec 194323.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México
25 Mar 194423.7Ordained PriestPriest of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México
13 Jun 195938.9AppointedBishop of Tlaxcala, México
12 Nov 195939.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tlaxcala, México
10 Feb 200180.6RetiredBishop of Tlaxcala, México
25 May 200180.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Tlaxcala, México

MicroData Summary for Luis Munive Escobar
Bishop Luis Munive Escobar (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tlaxcala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Ana Chiautempan
Ordained PriestCathedral, Puebla, Archdiocese of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 41.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 101
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)
  • od/c1: CB, 31 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018