Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sefafín Vásquez Elizalde

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Guzmán, Jalisco, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1922Born
2 May 194825.6Ordained PriestPriest
16 Mar 196845.5AppointedBishop of Huejutla, Hidalgo, México
29 May 196845.7Ordained BishopBishop of Huejutla, Hidalgo, México
2 Dec 197755.2AppointedBishop of Ciudad Guzmán, Jalisco, México
11 Dec 199977.2RetiredBishop of Ciudad Guzmán, Jalisco, México
10 Feb 200986.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Ciudad Guzmán, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for Sefafín Vásquez Elizalde
Bishop Sefafín Vásquez Elizalde (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Guzmán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Martin Xaltocan

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 40.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018