Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Guadalajara

Archidioecesis Guadalaiarensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 26 January 1863
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Jalisco
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 20,827 (8,044 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Occidente
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquidiocesisgdl.org/
  • Mailing Address: Alfred R. Plascensia 995, Col. Chapultepec Country, Apartado 61-33, 44620 Guadalajara, Jal., México
  • Telephone: (33)3614-55-04
  • Fax: 3658-23-00

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Guadalajara
13 July 1548ErectedDiocese of Michoacán Diocese of Guadalajara (erected)
28 September 1620Territory LostDiocese of Guadalajara Diocese of Durango (erected)
15 December 1777Territory LostDiocese of Guadalajara
Diocese of Michoacán
Archdiocese of México
Diocese of Linares o Nueva León (erected) (Nuevo León, Coahuila, Tamaulipas, and Texas)
Archdiocese of Guadalajara
26 January 1863ElevatedDiocese of Guadalajara Archdiocese of Guadalajara
26 January 1863Territory LostArchdiocese of Guadalajara Diocese of Zacatecas (erected)
11 December 1881Territory LostArchdiocese of Guadalajara Diocese of Colima (erected)
23 June 1891Territory LostArchdiocese of Guadalajara Diocese of Tepic (erected)
27 August 1899Territory LostArchdiocese of Guadalajara Diocese of Aguascalientes (erected)
14 March 1924Territory LostArchdiocese of Guadalajara (Encarnación and Teocaltiche along with El Bajío, Michoacanejo, and Belén and S. Sebastiano) Diocese of Aguascalientes
28 January 1961Territory LostDiocese of Colima (Autlan de Navarro, Cabo Corrientes (Tuito), Casimiro Castillo, Ejutla, El Grullo, La Huerta, El Limón, Purificación, Tomatlán, Cihuatlán, and Cuatitlán)
Archdiocese of Guadalajara (Atengo, Ayutla, Cuautlá, Juchitlán, Tecolotlán, Tenamaxtlán, and Unión de Tula)
Diocese of Autlán (erected)
25 March 1972Territory LostDiocese of Colima (Atenquique, Huescalapa, San Gabriel, Santa Cruz del Cortijo, San Juan de la Montaña, Tamazula, Tuxpan, and Zapotiltic)
Archdiocese of Guadalajara (San José and San Antonio, existing in the city of Ciudad Guzmán; Atemajac de Brizuela, Amacueda, Atoyac, Concepción de Buenos Aires, Chiquilistlán, Mazamitla, Manzanilla, Quitupán, Sayula, San Andrés Ixtlán, Teocuitatlán, Techaluta, Tapalpa, Tipazán ...)
Diocese of Ciudad Guzmán (erected)
25 March 1972Territory LostArchdiocese of Guadalajara (De la Sangre de Cristo and Nuestra Señora de Guadalupe (in San Juan de Los Lagos); San Miguel and San Felipe de Jesús (in Atotonilco and Alto); San Francisco de Asís, Tototlán, Sagrada Familia, and San Francisco (in Tepatitlán); Capilla de Guadalupe, ...) Diocese of San Juan de los Lagos (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Guadalajara
19501,390,0001,410,00098.6%630666961,9971961,507128ap1951
19662,100,0002,150,00097.7%7551629172,2903362,415141ap1967
19702,591,228.0%74122096104302,500161ap1971
19762,235,0002,350,00095.1%6222298512,6264142,442169ap1977
19802,442,0002,599,00094.0%6722509222,6484602,820202ap1981
19904,176,0004,396,00095.0%747908374,98912842,358253ap1991
19995,700,0006,000,00095.0%9064261,3324,27929703,282344ap2000
20005,890,0006,200,00095.0%9174261,3434,38521,0223,365358ap2001
20015,733,0006,300,00091.0%9242861,2104,73827833,633365ap2002
20025,715,0006,300,00090.7%9822881,2704,50028323,387385ap2003
20035,915,0006,500,00091.0%9933481,3414,41018442,893393ap2004
20046,011,0446,600,00091.1%1,0073471,3544,43949973,189399ap2005
20066,164,0006,773,00091.0%9923351,3274,64538512,948419ap2007
20135,355,0005,950,00090.0%1,1163531,4693,64538212,977459ap2014
20165,525,3596,168,30089.6%1,2433451,5883,47928042,893477ap2017
20195,692,3006,229,80091.4%1,2713421,6133,52927552,910493ap2020
20215,860,9806,415,90091.4%1,2933331,6263,60426752,479493ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Guadalajara
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 149, to Page 150

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 25 May 2024