Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcelino Hernández Rodríguez

Bishop of Colima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1946 BornSan Luis Potosi
22 Apr 197326.9Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
5 Jan 199851.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
5 Jan 199851.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Ancusa
5 Feb 199851.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ancusa
23 Feb 200861.7AppointedBishop of Orizaba, Veracruz, México
22 Apr 200861.9InstalledBishop of Orizaba, Veracruz, México
11 Nov 201367.5AppointedBishop of Colima, México
10 Jan 201467.6InstalledBishop of Colima, México

MicroData Summary for Marcelino Hernández Rodríguez:
Bishop Marcelino Hernández Rodríguez (born ) Bishop of Colima

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Colima.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,235
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Jun 2014