Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio López Aviña

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Durango, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1915Born
29 Oct 193924.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jun 195539.8AppointedBishop of Zacatecas, México
21 Sep 195540.0Ordained BishopBishop of Zacatecas, México
14 Dec 196146.3AppointedArchbishop of Durango, México
4 Mar 199377.5RetiredArchbishop of Durango, México
25 Feb 200488.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Durango, México

MicroData Summary for Antonio López Aviña
Archbishop Antonio López Aviña (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Durango

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChalchihuites

  • a priest for 64.3 years
  • a bishop for 48.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 82
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018