Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Esaúl Robles Jiménez

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora, Michoacán


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1925BornJalpa
2 Apr 194923.8Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jul 196237.1AppointedBishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México
14 Sep 196237.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México
12 Dec 197449.5AppointedBishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México
17 Oct 199368.4DiedBishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México

MicroData Summary for José Esaúl Robles Jiménez:
Bishop José Esaúl Robles Jiménez (born , died ) Bishop of Zamora

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 141

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 7 Oct 2014