Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Zacatecas

Dioecesis Zacatecensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 26 January 1863
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of San Luis Potosí
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Zacatecas
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 59,000 (22,788 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Occidente
  • Official Web Site: http://www.obispadozacatecas.org.mx/
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Apartado 1, Miguel Auza 219, 98000 Zacatecas, Zac., México
  • Telephone: (492)922-65-37; 922-02-32
  • Fax: 922-23-42

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
26 January 1863ErectedArchdiocese of Guadalajara Diocese of Zacatecas (erected)
13 January 1962Territory LostDiocese of Colima
Archdiocese of Durango
Diocese of Zacatecas
Territorial Prelature of Jesús María (del Nayar) (erected)
25 November 2006Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Zacatecas (from Guadalajara)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950557,000561,52199.2%11911204,64155ap1951
1965616,151620,15199.4%22042242,750434845ap1967
1968616,151620,15199.4%20142053,0051838052ap1971
1976829,717846,65098.0%18331864,4602331090ap1977
1980874,000919,00095.1%18041844,750834886ap1981
19901,300,0001,400,00092.9%17641807,222835097ap1991
19991,040,7831,085,00095.9%17151765,913739997ap2000
20001,150,0001,200,00095.8%18351886,1172639097ap2001
20011,200,0001,300,00092.3%18751926,2503240397ap2002
20021,300,0001,350,00096.3%19051956,66626380101ap2003
20031,300,0001,350,00096.3%18851936,73527380103ap2004
20041,300,0001,350,00096.3%19171986,56517375104ap2005
20081,124,0001,380,00081.4%20172085,40330407108ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 4 Jul 2013