Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jesús Carlos Cabrero Romero

Archbishop of San Luis Potosí


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1946 BornSan Luis Potosi
12 Apr 197225.9Ordained PriestPriest of San Luis Potosí, México
8 Oct 200862.4AppointedBishop of Zacatecas, México
19 Dec 200862.6Ordained BishopBishop of Zacatecas, México
3 Apr 201265.9AppointedArchbishop of San Luis Potosí, México
16 May 201266.0InstalledArchbishop of San Luis Potosí, México

MicroData Summary for Jesús Carlos Cabrero Romero:
Archbishop Jesús Carlos Cabrero Romero (born ) Archbishop of San Luis Potosí

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of San Luis Potosí.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Oct 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 16,000
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Apr 2012
  • i: CB, 6 Apr 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013