Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Mario Chávez Ruvalcaba

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Zacatecas, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1932Born
23 Dec 196129.0Ordained PriestPriest of Zacatecas, México
20 Jan 199966.1AppointedBishop of Zacatecas, México
20 Mar 199966.3Ordained BishopBishop of Zacatecas, México
8 Oct 200875.8RetiredBishop of Zacatecas, México
15 Sep 202188.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Zacatecas, México

MicroData Summary for Fernando Mario Chávez Ruvalcaba
Bishop Fernando Mario Chávez Ruvalcaba (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Zacatecas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZacatecas, Diocese of Zacatecas
Ordained BishopMonumental Plaza de Toros, Zacatecas, Diocese of Zacatecas
Death PlaceZacatecas, Diocese of Zacatecas

  • a priest for 59.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Oct 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,489
  • d: CB, 15 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Sep 2021

Quantcast