Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Aguascalientes

Dioecesis de Aguas Calientes



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 27 August 1899
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Guadalajara
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Aguascalientes
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 11,038 (4,263 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Occidente
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Apartado 167, Venustiano Carranza 106, 20000 Aguascalientes, Ags., Mexico
  • Telephone: (449) 915-32-61
  • Fax: 916-33-12

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
27 August 1899ErectedArchdiocese of Guadalajara Diocese of Aguascalientes (erected)
14 March 1924Territory AddedArchdiocese of Guadalajara (Encarnación and Teocaltiche along with El Bajío, Michoacanejo, and Belén and S. Sebastiano) Diocese of Aguascalientes
17 February 1954Territory AddedDiocese of Aguascalientes
Diocese of Zacatecas

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1948257,804260,50099.0%10771142,261733721ap1951
1958265,000266,90899.3%134111451,82733022ap1960
1963313,000314,09799.7%137131502,0864937024ap1967
1970438,936440,93699.5%136141502,9265947427ap1971
1976535,000540,93698.9%135161513,5434253533ap1977
1980549,000555,00098.9%131181493,6846951136ap1981
19901,005,5001,026,00098.0%159231825,5246453864ap1991
19991,452,5001,475,00098.5%211422535,7419759179ap2000
20001,472,5001,495,00098.5%214452595,6859959579ap2001
20011,472,5001,495,00098.5%225452705,4539959579ap2002
20021,503,5001,525,00098.6%216472635,7168263589ap2003
20031,527,5001,550,00098.5%220472675,7209564890ap2004
20041,557,0001,580,00098.5%236352715,7456865594ap2005
20061,599,0001,622,00098.6%232612935,45719067099ap2007
20121,665,7951,709,23097.5%267393065,443157669108ap2013
20151,687,0451,732,34097.4%270403105,442158675109ap2016
20181,735,9211,794,17196.8%275433185,45859481120ap2019
20201,450,1231,547,49893.7%319383574,06154470125ap2021
20221,520,2871,652,27792.0%322333554,28269652125ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 83
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 41
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 16, Page 429, and Page 430
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 63, Page 225, to Page 227

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 1 Apr 2024