Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emilio Carlos Berlie Belaunzarán

Archbishop Emeritus of Yucatán


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1939 BornAguascalientes
3 Jul 196626.6Ordained PriestPriest of Aguascalientes, México
3 Jun 198343.5AppointedBishop of Tijuana, Baja California Norte, México
25 Jul 198343.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tijuana, Baja California Norte, México
15 Mar 199555.3AppointedArchbishop of Yucatán, México
29 Apr 199555.4InstalledArchbishop of Yucatán, México
1 Jun 201575.5RetiredArchbishop of Yucatán, México

MicroData Summary for Emilio Carlos Berlie Belaunzarán:
Archbishop Emilio Carlos Berlie Belaunzarán (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Yucatán

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Yucatán.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 1 Jun 2015