Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rafael Romo Muñoz

Archbishop Emeritus of Tijuana, Baja California Norte


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1940 BornTorreón
28 Nov 196525.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jan 199655.1AppointedBishop of Tijuana, Baja California Norte, México
24 Feb 199655.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tijuana, Baja California Norte, México
25 Nov 200666.0AppointedArchbishop of Tijuana, Baja California Norte, México
16 Jun 201675.5RetiredArchbishop of Tijuana, Baja California Norte, México

MicroData Summary for Rafael Romo Muñoz
Archbishop Rafael Romo Muñoz (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tijuana

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Tijuana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Nov 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,687
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Jun 2016