Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan María Huerta Muro, O.F.M.

Prelate of El Salto, Durango


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1962 BornGuadalajara
10 Apr 198826.0Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
1 Jul 198927.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
2 Feb 201249.8AppointedPrelate of El Salto, Durango, México
2 May 201250.1Ordained BishopPrelate of El Salto, Durango, México

MicroData Summary for Juan María Huerta Muro:
Bishop Juan María Huerta Muro O.F.M. (born ) Prelate of El Salto

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of El Salto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2012
  • ob: CB, 18 Feb 2012
  • c2: CB, 16 Apr 2012
  • c34: CB, 3 May 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,428

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013