Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Castro Castro

Bishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1956 BornTeocuitatlán de Corona
13 May 198226.3Ordained PriestPriest of Tijuana, Baja California Norte, México
2 Apr 200448.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Yucatán, México
2 Apr 200448.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Suelli
3 Jun 200448.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Suelli
8 Apr 200650.2AppointedBishop of Campeche, México
15 May 201357.3AppointedBishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México
10 Jul 201357.5InstalledBishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México

MicroData Summary for Ramón Castro Castro:
Bishop Ramón Castro Castro (born ) Bishop of Cuernavaca

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cuernavaca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,605
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2006
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013