Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Bertello

President of the Governatorate of Vatican City State

Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia

Member of the Council of Cardinals

President of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1942 BornFoglizzo, Italy
29 Jun 196623.7Ordained PriestPriest
17 Oct 198745.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Urbs Salvia
17 Oct 198745.0AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Benin
17 Oct 198745.0AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Ghana
17 Oct 198745.0AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Togo
28 Nov 198745.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Urbs Salvia
12 Jan 199148.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Rwanda
Mar 199552.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Other
27 Dec 200058.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to México
11 Jan 200764.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Italy
11 Jan 200764.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to San Marino
1 Oct 201169.0AppointedPresident of the Governatorate of Vatican City State
1 Oct 201169.0AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State
18 Feb 201269.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
18 Feb 201269.4Elevated to CardinalPresident of the Governatorate of Vatican City State
17 Jun 201269.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
13 Apr 201370.5AppointedMember of the Council of Cardinals

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Bertello:
Giuseppe Cardinal Bertello (born ) President of Governatorate of Vatican City State

Please contact the Cardinal through the Governatorate of Vatican City State.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,420
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Sep 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • card: Bollettino, 6 Jan 2012
  • 1v01: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2012
  • i: Bollettino, 1 Jun 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Apr 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 18 Oct 2014