Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Moreno Barrón

Archbishop of Tijuana, Baja California Norte


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1954 BornSalamanca
25 Feb 197924.3Ordained PriestPriest of Morelia, Michoacán, México
2 Feb 200247.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Morelia, Michoacán, México
2 Feb 200247.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Gaguari
20 Mar 200247.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gaguari
28 Mar 200853.4AppointedBishop of Tlaxcala, México
28 May 200853.6InstalledBishop of Tlaxcala, México
16 Jun 201661.7AppointedArchbishop of Tijuana, Baja California Norte, México

MicroData Summary for Francisco Moreno Barrón
Archbishop Francisco Moreno Barrón (born ) Archbishop of Tijuana

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Tijuana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Mar 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,152
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Jun 2016