Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Estanislao Alcaraz y Figueroa

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Morelia, Michoacán


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1918BornPatzcuaro
19 Dec 194224.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 195940.2AppointedBishop of Matamoros, Tamaulipas, México
12 Apr 195940.4Ordained BishopBishop of Matamoros, Tamaulipas, México
3 Mar 196849.3AppointedBishop of San Luis Potosí, México
3 Jul 197253.6AppointedArchbishop of Morelia, Michoacán, México
20 Jan 199576.2RetiredArchbishop of Morelia, Michoacán, México
13 Jul 200687.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Morelia, Michoacán, México

MicroData Summary for Estanislao Alcaraz y Figueroa:
Archbishop Estanislao Alcaraz y Figueroa (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Morelia

  • a priest for 63.5 years
  • a bishop for 47.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 32
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 14 Feb 2015