Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Matamoros

Dioecesis Matamorensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Ruy Rendón Leal, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 16 February 1958
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Monterrey
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Tamaulipas
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 19,457 (7,515 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Noreste
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesisdematamoros.org/
  • Mailing Address: Apartado 70, Calle 5 Entre Morelos y González, 87351 Matamoros, Tamps., México
  • Telephone: (188)13.55.11;13.36.58;13.36.58
  • Fax: 16.06.08

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
16 February 1958ErectedDiocese of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas Diocese of Matamoros (erected)
21 December 1964Territory LostDiocese of Matamoros
Diocese of Tampico
Diocese of Ciudad Victoria (erected)
6 November 1989Territory LostDiocese of Matamoros
Archdiocese of Monterrey
Diocese of Nuevo Laredo (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1966515,000575,00089.6%38135110,098239027ap1967
1968540,000600,00090.0%6118796,8353311129ap1971
1976660,000800,00082.5%5812709,4282413042ap1977
1980740,000930,00079.6%6413779,61011613246ap1981
19901,207,0001,610,00075.0%68138114,9012012760ap1991
19991,392,0441,739,49280.0%78108815,818109850ap2000
20001,433,8051,791,67680.0%8899714,781910050ap2001
20011,505,4951,881,26080.0%8979615,68288047ap2002
20021,656,0442,069,38680.0%89109916,727118647ap2003
20032,844,0903,070,30692.6%1111212323,1224127952ap2004
20041,665,0001,850,00090.0%991211115,0004128856ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 6 Dec 2011