Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Javier Chavolla Ramos

Archbishop of Toluca, México, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1946 Born
10 Dec 197226.5Ordained PriestPriest of Tijuana, Baja California Norte, México
1 Jun 199144.9AppointedBishop of Matamoros, Tamaulipas, México
16 Jul 199145.1Ordained BishopBishop of Matamoros, Tamaulipas, México
27 Dec 200357.5AppointedBishop of Toluca, México, México
12 Feb 200457.6InstalledBishop of Toluca, México, México
28 Sep 201973.3AppointedArchbishop of Toluca, México, México
18 Nov 201973.4InstalledArchbishop of Toluca, México, México

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier Chavolla Ramos
Archbishop Francisco Javier Chavolla Ramos (born ) Archbishop of Toluca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAutlán de la Grana
Ordained BishopAuditorio Municipal, Matamoros, Diocese of Matamoros, Tamaulipas

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Toluca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,604
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Sep 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast