Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Querétaro

Dioecesis Queretarensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 26 January 1863
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of León
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Querétaro
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 15,326 (5,919 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Bajío
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesisdequeretaro.org.mx/
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Reforma 48, Apdo. 49, 76000 Querétaro, Qro., México
  • Telephone: (442)224-07-38; 212-10-33
  • Fax: 212-18-45

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
26 January 1863ErectedDiocese of Michoacán
Archdiocese of México
Diocese of Querétaro (erected)
5 November 1988Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Querétaro (From Morelia (Mexico) to San Luis Potosi (Mexico))
25 November 2006Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Querétaro (from San Luis Potos¡)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950280,600281,00099.9%8710972,8926022035ap1951
1965422,083422,61299.9%124381622,60513539953ap1967
1970521,795523,90099.6%133391723,0337544366ap1971
1976566,000595,00095.1%136642002,83012739450ap1977
1980715,000735,00097.3%125621873,82313037754ap1981
19901,599,1961,681,78695.1%147972446,554127459076ap1991
19991,578,3841,581,38499.8%1681002685,8892391,48086ap2000
20001,578,8341,582,15999.8%1701002705,8472231,48088ap2001
20011,578,8341,582,15999.8%1741002745,7622231,48088ap2002
20021,615,2231,618,54899.8%1651002656,0952121,48091ap2003
20031,677,5481,682,54899.7%184962805,9911511,05092ap2004
20041,643,5321,730,03495.0%193962895,6861361,11094ap2005
20101,809,0001,856,00097.5%2201183385,352189882109ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 4 Jun 2013