Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Florencio Olvera Ochoa

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1933Born
26 Oct 195825.0Ordained PriestPriest of Querétaro, México
19 Oct 199259.0AppointedBishop of Tabasco, México
30 Nov 199259.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tabasco, México
22 Feb 200268.3AppointedBishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México
10 Jul 200975.7RetiredBishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México
20 Dec 202087.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México

MicroData Summary for Florencio Olvera Ochoa
Bishop Florencio Olvera Ochoa (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cuernavaca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTequisquiapan
Ordained BishopMonumental Plaza de Toros, Villahermosa de San Juan Bautista
Death PlaceQuerétaro, Diocese of Querétaro

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,053
  • d: CB, 20 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 20 Dec 2020

Quantcast