Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Garcia González

Deceased

Bishop of León, Guanajuato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1926Born
2 Apr 194922.8Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
10 Jul 197246.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
10 Jul 197246.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Urbs Salvia
15 Aug 197246.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Urbs Salvia
30 May 197448.0AppointedBishop of Tabasco, México
4 Jan 199265.6AppointedBishop of León, Guanajuato, México
8 Nov 199468.4DiedBishop of León, Guanajuato, México

MicroData Summary for Rafael Garcia González:
Bishop Rafael Garcia González (born , died ) Bishop of León

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015