Catholic-Hierarchy DC

José Cardinal Garibi y Rivera

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Guadalajara, Jalisco

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1889BornGuadalajara
25 Feb 191223.0Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
16 Dec 192940.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
16 Dec 192940.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhosus
7 May 193041.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhosus
22 Dec 193445.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
22 Dec 193445.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Bizya
18 Feb 193647.0SucceededArchbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
15 Dec 195869.8Elevated to Cardinal
15 Dec 195869.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio
1 Mar 196980.0RetiredArchbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
27 May 197283.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for José Garibi y Rivera:
José Cardinal Garibi y Rivera (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Guadalajara

  • a priest for 60.2 years
  • a bishop for 42.0 years
  • a cardinal for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015