Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacinto Guerrero Torres

Deceased

Bishop of Tlaxcala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1934BornArandas
3 May 196429.7Ordained PriestPriest
5 Dec 199056.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Tlaxcala, México
6 Jan 199156.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Tlaxcala, México
10 Feb 200166.4SucceededBishop of Tlaxcala, México
27 Dec 200672.3DiedBishop of Tlaxcala, México

MicroData Summary for Jacinto Guerrero Torres:
Bishop Jacinto Guerrero Torres (born , died ) Bishop of Tlaxcala

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,304
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 17 Nov 2014