Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel María de la Mora y Mora

Deceased

Bishop of San Luis Potosí


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1874BornIxtlahuacán del Río
30 Nov 189723.3Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
9 Feb 191136.5AppointedBishop of Zacatecas, México
7 May 191136.7Ordained BishopBishop of Zacatecas, México
18 May 191136.8InstalledBishop of Zacatecas, México
24 Feb 192247.5AppointedBishop of San Luis Potosí, México
28 Jun 192247.9InstalledBishop of San Luis Potosí, México
14 Jul 193055.9DiedBishop of San Luis Potosí, México

MicroData Summary for Miguel María de la Mora y Mora:
Bishop Miguel María de la Mora y Mora (born , died ) Bishop of San Luis Potosí

  • a priest for 32.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013