Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan María Navarrete y Guerrero

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Hermosillo, Sonora

Titular Archbishop of Vulturaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1886BornAguascalientes
10 Apr 190922.7Ordained PriestPriest of Aguascalientes, México
24 Jan 191932.4AppointedBishop of Sonora, México
8 Jun 191932.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sonora, México
13 Jul 191932.9InstalledBishop of Sonora, México
4 Sep 196377.1AppointedArchbishop of Hermosillo, Sonora, México
13 Aug 196882.0RetiredArchbishop of Hermosillo, Sonora, México
13 Aug 196882.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Vulturaria
21 Feb 198295.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Hermosillo, Sonora, México

MicroData Summary for Juan María Navarrete y Guerrero:
Archbishop Juan María Navarrete y Guerrero (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Hermosillo

  • a priest for 72.9 years
  • a bishop for 62.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013