Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eulogio Gregorio Clemente Gillow y Zavalza

Deceased

Archbishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1841Born
12 Dec 186524.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 Dec 186524.7Ordained PriestPriest
23 May 188746.1AppointedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
31 Jul 188746.3Ordained BishopBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
17 Nov 188746.6InstalledBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
23 Jun 189150.2AppointedArchbishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
19 May 192281.1DiedArchbishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México

MicroData Summary for Eulogio Gregorio Clemente Gillow y Zavalza (VIAF: 57807235)
Archbishop Eulogio Gregorio Clemente Gillow y Zavalza (born , died ) Archbishop of Antequera, Oaxaca

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuebla
Ordained BishopLa Professa, Mexico City, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 105
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 57
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017