Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filemón Fierro y Terán

Deceased

Bishop of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas, Tamaulipas, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1859Born
23 Dec 188223.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 189737.3AppointedBishop of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas, Tamaulipas, México
13 Jun 189737.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas, Tamaulipas, México
30 Jun 189737.6InstalledBishop of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas, Tamaulipas, México
7 Jul 190545.6DiedBishop of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas, Tamaulipas, México

MicroData Summary for Filemón Fierro y Terán (VIAF: 169670809)
Bishop Filemón Fierro y Terán (born , died ) Bishop of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuichapa, Archdiocese of Durango
Ordained BishopCathedral, Durango, Archdiocese of Durango

  • a priest for 22.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 208
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017