Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquín Fernández de Madrid y Canal

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Tanagra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1801BornMexico
18 Jul 182423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México
19 Dec 183433.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanagra
28 Dec 183433.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanagra
25 Dec 186160.5DiedTitular Bishop of Tanagra

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Fernández de Madrid y Canal:
Bishop Joaquín Fernández de Madrid y Canal (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Tanagra

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 357

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013