Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Genovesi

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Mitylene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1765BornRoma, Italy
17 Dec 183267.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
30 Dec 183267.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
8 Jan 183569.7DiedTitular Archbishop of Mitylene

MicroData Summary for Domenico Genovesi
Archbishop Domenico Genovesi (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Mitylene

  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 267
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1832, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 12 Aug 2016