Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lorenzo Girolamo Cardinal Mattei

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1748BornRome, Italy
13 Jun 177224.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Sep 182274.3AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
29 Sep 182274.3Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
15 Apr 183384.9Elevated to Cardinal
24 Jul 183385.2DiedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Girolamo Mattei:
Cardinal Lorenzo Girolamo Mattei (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
  • a cardinal for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013