Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Evasio Secundo Agodino

Deceased

Bishop of Aosta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1776³Born
29 May 179013.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 182447.5SelectedBishop of Aosta, Italy
12 Jul 182447.8ConfirmedBishop of Aosta, Italy
18 Jul 182447.8Ordained BishopBishop of Aosta, Italy
24 Apr 183154.6DiedBishop of Aosta, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Evasio Secundo Agodino (VIAF: 90315373)
Bishop Evasio Secundo Agodino (born , died ) Bishop of Aosta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorino

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,828
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 94
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,824, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast