Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Giuseppe Benedetto Mercy d’Argenteau

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Germany

Titular Archbishop of Tyrus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1787³BornLiège
10 Aug 182538.3Ordained PriestPriest of Liège, Belgium
2 Oct 182639.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
3 Oct 182639.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
8 Oct 182639.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
1837¹49.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
16 Nov 187992.6DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Giuseppe Benedetto Mercy d’Argenteau
Archbishop Carlo Giuseppe Benedetto Mercy d’Argenteau (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Germany

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 53.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 382
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1826, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 Jun 2016