Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Theodor Laurent

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Luxembourg

Titular Bishop of Chersonesus in Creta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1804BornAix-la-Chapelle
14 Mar 182924.6Ordained PriestPriest of Ličge, Belgium
17 Sep 183935.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions, Germany
17 Sep 183935.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Chersonesus in Creta
27 Dec 183935.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chersonesus in Creta
25 Feb 184237.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Luxembourg
28 Jul 185652.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Luxembourg
20 Feb 188479.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Luxembourg

MicroData Summary for Johann Theodor Laurent (VIAF: 89167005)
Bishop Johann Theodor Laurent (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Luxembourg

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 44.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 148
  • c2+: Google Books
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1839, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Nov 2016