Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Godehard Braun

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

Titular Bishop of Callinicum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1798BornVallendar
29 Dec 182325.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Trier, Germany
13 Mar 182425.2Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
2 Apr 184950.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
2 Apr 184950.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Callinicum
7 Oct 184950.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Callinicum
22 May 186162.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Godehard Braun:
Bishop Godehard Braun (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

  • a priest for 37.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 173

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013