Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Johannes Cardinal von Geissel

Deceased

Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1796BornGimmeldingen
7 Mar 181822.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Speyer, Germany
22 Aug 181822.5Ordained PriestPriest of Speyer, Germany
9 Oct 183640.7SelectedBishop of Speyer, Germany
19 May 183741.3ConfirmedBishop of Speyer, Germany
13 Aug 183741.5Ordained BishopBishop of Speyer, Germany
24 Sep 184145.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
23 May 184246.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Iconium
19 Oct 184549.7SucceededArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
24 Nov 184549.8InstalledArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
30 Sep 185054.7Elevated to Cardinal
19 Mar 185761.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
8 Sep 186468.6DiedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes von Geissel:
Cardinal Johannes von Geissel (born , died ) Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 27.1 years
  • a cardinal for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 49
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 156, and Page 222
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 351

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013