Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Georg Müller

Deceased

Bishop of Münster


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1798BornKoblenz
9 Sep 182122.9Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
22 Jul 184445.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
22 Jul 184445.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thaumacus
12 Jan 184546.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thaumacus
1 Jul 184748.7SelectedBishop of Münster, Germany
4 Oct 184748.9ConfirmedBishop of Münster, Germany
22 Dec 184749.1InstalledBishop of Münster, Germany
19 Jan 187071.2DiedBishop of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Georg Müller (VIAF: 47543875)
Bishop Johann Georg Müller (born , died ) Bishop of Münster

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 391
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 364
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,641
  • ob/c2+: ATh
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1845, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Nov 2016