Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Freusberg

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

Titular Bishop of Sidyma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1806Born
4 May 183023.5Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
7 Apr 185447.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
7 Apr 185447.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidyma
14 May 185447.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sidyma
14 Nov 188983.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Josef Freusberg
Bishop Josef Freusberg (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBilstein, Diocese of Paderborn
Ordained BishopCathedral, Paderborn, Diocese of Paderborn

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 518
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1854, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017