Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Wilhelm Sommerwerk (Jacobi)

Deceased

Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1821Born
24 Sep 184625.4Ordained PriestPriest of Hildesheim, Germany
13 Apr 187149.9SelectedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
27 Oct 187150.5ConfirmedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
31 Dec 187150.6Ordained BishopBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
18 Dec 190584.6DiedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany

MicroData Summary for Daniel Wilhelm Sommerwerk (Jacobi) (VIAF: 80433711)
Bishop Daniel Wilhelm Sommerwerk (Jacobi) (born , died ) Bishop of Hildesheim

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMinden, Diocese of Paderborn
Ordained BishopHildesheim, Diocese of Hildesheim

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 306
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Apr 2017