Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Henricus Schaap, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname, Suriname

Titular Bishop of Etalonia (Hetalonia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1823BornAmsterdam, Netherlands
24 May 184521.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
13 Aug 185026.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
20 Jun 187652.7AppointedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname, Suriname, Antilles
10 Sep 188057.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname, Suriname, Antilles
10 Sep 188057.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Etalonia (Hetalonia)
10 Oct 188057.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Etalonia (Hetalonia)
19 Mar 188965.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname, Suriname, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Johannes Henricus Schaap:
Bishop Johannes Henricus Schaap C.SS.R. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 304
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013