Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Warren Currier

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Matanzas

Titular Bishop of Etalonia (Hetalonia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1857BornSaint Thomas, Virgin Islands (USA)
25 May 187518.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
24 Nov 188023.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
1892²34.8IncardinatedPriest
25 Jun 191053.3AppointedBishop of Zamboanga, Philippines
26 Apr 191356.1AppointedBishop of Matanzas, Cuba
6 Jul 191356.3Ordained BishopBishop of Matanzas, Cuba
16 Jun 191457.2ResignedBishop of Matanzas, Cuba
16 Jun 191558.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Etalonia (Hetalonia)
23 Sep 191861.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Matanzas, Cuba

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Charles Warren Currier:
Bishop Charles Warren Currier (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Matanzas

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 29 Sep 2013